This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 01/04/2022 at 23:07:34 (UTC).

BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC Et Al VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/01/2021 BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********16AX

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC

KARI JONES

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY D BARAK

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/01/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/01/2021 - COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

12/01/2021 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 12/17/2021 AS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

12/17/2021 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 12/17/2021 AS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • Hearing01/10/2022 at 01:00PM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • Hearing01/03/2022 at 11:30AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: RESCHEDULED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$100.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 983616; Tender Amount: $10.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 1/10/2022 at 0100 PM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1386449

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 1/3/2022 1130 AM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results RESCHEDULED on 12/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 12/17/2021 AS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 983616

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00 AssessmentID 11813723

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$100.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 978708; Tender Amount: $90.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS PAID /// SUMMONS NOT ISSUED //// INCORRECT SUMMONS ATTACHED TO CASE //// MUST SUBMIT CORRECT SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE "EMAIL" ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION TO BE ISSUED AS TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketBOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC KARI JONES ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFITS AS ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 12/2/2021 - id number 2313503

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $80.00 AssessmentID 11804594

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCase 412021SC008716SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 12/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARAK, ANTHONY