This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 01/10/2022 at 22:25:19 (UTC).

BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC Et Al VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********01AX

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC

GRACE BLACK

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY D BARAK

Defendant Attorney

MEGAN TOBIN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/24/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/24/2021 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY - 12/7/2021

11/24/2021 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY - 12/7/2021

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

12/22/2021 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 - ATTY MEGAN TOBIN OBO DEFENDANT

12/22/2021 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 - ATTY MEGAN TOBIN OBO DEFENDANT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 - ATTY MEGAN TOBIN OBO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 12/20/2021 0100 PM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results CONTINUED on 12/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Hearing12/20/2021 at 01:00PM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF: REPRESENTED BY BRIAN FORMAN, ESQ DEFENDANT: REPRESENTED BY STACEY KIRCHER, ESQ DENY-MOTIONS TO BE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$90.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 976838; Tender Amount: $90.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE "EMAIL" ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY - 12/7/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketBOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC ASSINGMENTS OF BENEFITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 976838

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 11/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 12/20/2021 at 0100 PM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1380149

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 11/25/2021 - id number 2310568

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $80.00 AssessmentID 11800737

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase 412021SC008601SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 11/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARAK, ANTHONY