This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 05/13/2022 at 23:54:43 (UTC).

BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC Et Al VS PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********54AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC

RODERICK CRADDOCK

Defendant

PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY D BARAK

Defendant Attorney

ROBERT L KLASSMAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/05/2022 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/05/2022 - COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/05/2022 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORTATION 1/16/2022

01/05/2022 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORTATION 1/16/2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ROBERT KLASSMAN OBO PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION,

02/01/2022 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ROBERT KLASSMAN OBO PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION,

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

03/18/2022 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

02/04/2022 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 2/7/2022 0100 PM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results DISMISSED on 2/7/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • Hearing02/07/2022 at 01:00PM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: DISMISSED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF-REPRESENTED BY BRIAN FORMAN DEFENDANT-NOT PRESENT SETTLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE ROBERT KLASSMAN OBO PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORATION,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$185.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 990378; Tender Amount: $185.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 990378

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 1/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE "EMAIL" ADDRESS / ANTHONY D BARAK ESQUIRE OBO PLANTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO PEAK PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE CORPORTATION 1/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketASSIGNMENT OF BENEFITS ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 1/6/2022 - id number 2329980

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00 AssessmentID 11825728

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCase 412022SC000154SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 1/5/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Peak Property and Casualty Insurance Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARAK, ANTHONY