This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 12/29/2021 at 22:04:35 (UTC).

BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC Et Al VS DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********18AX

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC

DEANNA SOTO

Defendant

DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY D BARAK

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/24/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT(COMMON ALLEGATIONS)

11/24/2021 - COMPLAINT(COMMON ALLEGATIONS)

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION SUMMONS ISSUED ON 11/24/2021 AS TO DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

11/24/2021 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION SUMMONS ISSUED ON 11/24/2021 AS TO DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

11/24/2021 - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • Hearing01/03/2022 at 01:00PM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$90.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 976958; Tender Amount: $90.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE "EMAIL" ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION SUMMONS ISSUED ON 11/24/2021 AS TO DIRECT GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT( BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFITS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT(COMMON ALLEGATIONS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 976958

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 11/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 1/3/2022 at 0100 PM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1380228

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 11/25/2021 - id number 2310722

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $80.00 AssessmentID 11800880

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase 412021SC008618SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 11/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Direct General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARAK, ANTHONY