This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 05/21/2022 at 23:20:58 (UTC).

BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC Et Al VS ASSURANCE AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ASSURANCE AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********64AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC

EMILIANO RAYGOZA

Defendant

ASSURANCE AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY D BARAK

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/12/2022 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/12/2022 - COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

01/12/2022 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION / TO BE ISSUED TO ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY 1/16/2022

01/12/2022 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION / TO BE ISSUED TO ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY 1/16/2022

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

03/04/2022 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 2/14/2022 0100 PM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results CONTINUED on 2/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Hearing02/14/2022 at 01:00PM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF-REPRESENTED BY BRIAN CRIM DEFENDANT-NOT PRESENT CONTINUED PENDING SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$185.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 991156; Tender Amount: $185.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 991156

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 1/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 2/14/2022 at 0100 PM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1392901

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE "EMAIL" ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION / TO BE ISSUED TO ASSURANCEAMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY 1/16/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT OF ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 1/13/2022 - id number 2331162

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00 AssessmentID 11827424

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCase 412022SC000264SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 1/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASSURANCE AMERICA INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC is a litigant