This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 01/29/2023 at 22:13:11 (UTC).

BOWES IMAGING CENTER Et Al VS USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 BOWES IMAGING CENTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********43AX

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE BLANTON STEELE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOWES IMAGING CENTER

TAYLOR BEAR

Defendant

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARLY R CHRISTINE

Defendant Attorney

MATTHEW ADAM MENENDEZ

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/29/2022 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/29/2022 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/2/2022 AS TO USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

11/29/2022 - SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/2/2022 AS TO USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE FILING - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SUMMONS SERVED USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY 12/5/2022

12/05/2022 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE FILING - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SUMMONS SERVED USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY 12/5/2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/27/2022 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS

MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

12/27/2022 - MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

01/05/2023 - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

COPY OF COUNTY COURT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SMALL CLAIMS PIP CASES

11/29/2022 - COPY OF COUNTY COURT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SMALL CLAIMS PIP CASES

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM/ CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT REQUESTED/ BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC TAYLOR BEAR ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFITS/ STATEMENT/ CERTIFIED MAIL/

11/29/2022 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM/ CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT REQUESTED/ BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC TAYLOR BEAR ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFITS/ STATEMENT/ CERTIFIED MAIL/

FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

11/29/2022 - FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIEF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

11/29/2022 - PLAINTIEF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES T DEFENDANT

11/29/2022 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES T DEFENDANT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE FILING - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SUMMONS SERVED USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY 12/5/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $65.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1093432; Tender Amount: $65.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1093432

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 12/1/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES T DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIEF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/2/2022 AS TO USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM/ CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT REQUESTED/ BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC TAYLOR BEAR ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFITS/ STATEMENT/ CERTIFIED MAIL/

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOPY OF COUNTY COURT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT AND SMALL CLAIMS PIP CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 11/30/2022 - id number 2460761

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $55.00 AssessmentID 12002150

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase 412022SC006843SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 11/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARLY R CHRISTINE