This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 12/01/2021 at 23:10:20 (UTC).

BOWES IMAGING CENTER Et Al VS INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 BOWES IMAGING CENTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********57AX

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOWES IMAGING CENTER

ROSE SALEM

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY D BARAK

Defendant Attorney

KEEGAN C LATHAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/28/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/28/2021 - COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

09/28/2021 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 9/30/2021 AS TO INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

09/28/2021 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 9/30/2021 AS TO INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/REQUEST CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRE- TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION, NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - ATTY KEEGAN C LATHAN OBO DEFENDANT

10/26/2021 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/REQUEST CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRE- TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION, NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - ATTY KEEGAN C LATHAN OBO DEFENDANT

AGREED ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCES AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

11/03/2021 - AGREED ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCES AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

JOINT STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

11/03/2021 - JOINT STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL

11/03/2021 - AMENDED JOINT STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL

DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

11/09/2021 - DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AN ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 11/8/2021 0100 PM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results CONTINUED on 11/8/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF: REPRESENTED BY BRIAN CRIM DEFENDANT: NOT PRESENT APPEARANCE WAIVED-MOTIONS TO BE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Hearing11/08/2021 at 01:00PM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED JOINT STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER WAIVING APPEARANCES AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE/REQUEST CANCELLATION OF SMALL CLAIMS PRE- TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION, NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - ATTY KEEGAN C LATHAN OBO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$185.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 960015; Tender Amount: $185.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 960015

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE "EMAIL" ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 9/30/2021 AS TO INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT-ASSIGNMENT OF BENEFITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 9/29/2021 - id number 2286393

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00 AssessmentID 11768585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase 412021SC007157SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 9/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Auto Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARAK, ANTHONY