This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 11/26/2021 at 23:15:13 (UTC).

BOWES IMAGING CENTER Et Al VS ALLSTATE

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 BOWES IMAGING CENTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MELISSA GOULD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********50AX

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MELISSA GOULD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOWES IMAGING CENTER

SHAWN POWERS

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT

Defendants

ALLSTATE

P.O. Box 650271

Dallas, TX 75265

KAREN S CLIFTON

Bradenton, FL 34205-3013

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ANTHONY D BARAK

ELIZABETH MURANTE FERRELL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/29/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/29/2021 - COMPLAINT

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 9/30/2021 AS TO KAREN S CLIFTON

09/29/2021 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 9/30/2021 AS TO KAREN S CLIFTON

RETURN OF SERVICE TO KAREN S CLIFTON ON 10/09/21

10/11/2021 - RETURN OF SERVICE TO KAREN S CLIFTON ON 10/09/21

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO COUNTY MEDIATION PROGRAM 12/1/2021 AT 11:30AM

11/15/2021 - ORDER OF REFERRAL TO COUNTY MEDIATION PROGRAM 12/1/2021 AT 11:30AM

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO COUNTY MEDIATION PROGRAM 12/1/2021 AT 11:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 10/25/2021 1100 AM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results CONTINUED on 10/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF: REPRESENTED BY TRISTAN WOLTERS DEFENDANT: PRESENT (LATE DUE TO ZOOM ISSUES) DEFAULT ENTERED AND THEN SET ASIDE CONTINUED FOR MEDIATION TO BE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Hearing10/25/2021 at 11:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE TO KAREN S CLIFTON ON 10/09/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$185.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 960329; Tender Amount: $185.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 960329

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 9/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 10/25/2021 at 1100 AM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1363537

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 9/30/2021 AS TO KAREN S CLIFTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT-EXHIBIT I-AFFIDAVIT, EXHIBIT II-BILL OF SALE, EXHIBIT III-ACCOUNT SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 9/30/2021 - id number 2286730

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00 AssessmentID 11768993

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2021
  • DocketCase Number Changed to 2021SC007050AX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCase 412021CC007050CCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 9/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLSTATE is a litigant

Latest cases where BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARAK, ANTHONY