This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/04/2022 at 04:04:29 (UTC).

BETH BARNETT Et Al VS ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

Case Summary

On 06/21/2022 BETH BARNETT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********21AX

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC

ELTON BARNETT

BETH BARNETT

Defendant

ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT FRANCIS GONZALEZ

Defendant Attorney

JACOB ARI EISENMAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/21/2022 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/21/2022 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP ON 6/23/2022

06/21/2022 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP ON 6/23/2022

CERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP,

06/21/2022 - CERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP,

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP. JULY 14, 2022

07/14/2022 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP. JULY 14, 2022

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL JACOB EISENMAN, ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT

07/14/2022 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL JACOB EISENMAN, ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT

MOTION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND TO WAIVE PARTIES' APPEARANCE AT THE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

07/15/2022 - MOTION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND TO WAIVE PARTIES' APPEARANCE AT THE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

MOTION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND TO WAIVE PARTIES' APPEARANCE AT THE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

07/19/2022 - MOTION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND TO WAIVE PARTIES' APPEARANCE AT THE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 7/18/2022 1100 AM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results HEARING HELD on 7/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND TO WAIVE PARTIES' APPEARANCE AT THE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • Hearing07/18/2022 at 11:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: HEARING HELD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING PLAINTIFF PRESENT, REPRESENTED BY AL LEHMAN, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT PRESENT, REPRESENTED BY JACOB EISENMAN MOTIONS TO BE FILED VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVING 2ND SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO INVOKE THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND TO WAIVE PARTIES' APPEARANCE AT THE PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVING 2X? REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT, ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL JACOB EISENMAN, ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP. JULY 14, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516(B)()(A)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCOPY OF CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PROTOCOLS FOR COUNTY COURT CIVIL CASES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP ON 6/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ASSIGNMENT OF INSURANCE CLAIM BENEFITS & DIRECT PAY AUTHORIZATION / INVOICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 6/22/2022 - id number 2396893

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00 AssessmentID 11917849

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCase 412022SC003621SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 6/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kidwell Group LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gonzalez, Robert Francis, ESQ.