This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/20/2022 at 05:44:49 (UTC).

BENJAMIN R HUNTER, GERALDINE E HAGUE Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 BENJAMIN R HUNTER, GERALDINE E HAGUE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********60AX

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Decedent

GERALDINE E HAGUE

Palmetto, FL 34221

Not Yet Classified

BENJAMIN R HUNTER

Sarasota, FL 34239

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

BENJAMIN RAY HUNTER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS - BENJAMIN R. HUNTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type CP INVENTORY DUE was satisfied with Compliance Action - COMPLETED set on 10/6/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketINVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION / NOTICE TO CREDITORS - 8/6/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCompliance CP 12 MONTHS - DISCH has been created with due date of 8/7/2022 - id number 2265901

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCompliance CP INVENTORY DUE has been created with due date of 10/5/2021 - id number 2265900

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF DEATH - GERALDINE E HAGUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$400.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 931755; Tender Amount: $400.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - GERALDINE E. HAGUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 931755

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT - BENJAMIN R. HUNTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11717240

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCase 412021CP001960CPAXMA Filed with Clerk on 6/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNTER, BENJAMIN