This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 05/19/2020 at 19:08:14 (UTC).

BENJAMIN JAY BARTH, TIMM KAEB Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 BENJAMIN JAY BARTH, TIMM KAEB was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENO G ECONOMOU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********95AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENO G ECONOMOU

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

TIMM KAEB

Palmetto, FL 34221

Decedent

BENJAMIN JAY BARTH

Ellenton, FL 34222

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

CHARLES JEROME PRATT JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF CLAIM - CLAIM DETAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - UNIVERSAL HEALTH SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING BENEFICIARIES OF DECEDENT - TIMM KAEB IS THE SOLE BENEFICIARY NAMED IN THE WILL OF THE DECEDENT, BENJAMIN JAY BARTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF BENEFICIARIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketINVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION - 2/28/2020 - NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF BEN J. BARTH - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF DEATH - BENJAMIN JAY BARTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketOATH OF WITNESS TO WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$400.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797727; Tender Amount: $400.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT - TIMM KAEB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketE-FILED COPY OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF BEN J. BARTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DEATH - BENJAMIN JAY, BARTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketOATH OF WITNESS TO WILL - NOT SIGNED WHEN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED - ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - SENT TO PROBATE COORDINATOR IN AM RUN ON 1/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less