This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 11/19/2021 at 13:35:30 (UTC).

BENJAMIN HARTMAN VS SUBARU OF AMERICA INC

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 BENJAMIN HARTMAN filed an Other lawsuit against SUBARU OF AMERICA INC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********28AX

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENJAMIN HARTMAN

Defendant

SUBARU OF AMERICA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RACHEL MONICA CICHOWIC

Defendant Attorney

JONATHAN YVES MARCELO

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/27/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND FOR BENJAMIN HARTMAN

08/27/2021 - COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND FOR BENJAMIN HARTMAN

SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO SUBARU OF AMERICA INC

09/17/2021 - SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO SUBARU OF AMERICA INC

SUMMONS SERVED SUBARU OF AMERICA INC 10/04/2021

10/11/2021 - SUMMONS SERVED SUBARU OF AMERICA INC 10/04/2021

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENTS ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. JONATHAN MARCELO OBO SUBARU OF AMERICA INC

10/11/2021 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENTS ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. JONATHAN MARCELO OBO SUBARU OF AMERICA INC

DEFENDANT, SUBARU OF AMERICA INC.'S, MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

11/04/2021 - DEFENDANT, SUBARU OF AMERICA INC.'S, MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO MOTION TO DISMISS - EXHIBIT A BUYERS ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, SUBARU OF AMERICA INC.'S, MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENTS ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT SUBARU OF AMERICA, INC. JONATHAN MARCELO OBO SUBARU OF AMERICA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED SUBARU OF AMERICA INC 10/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$410.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 959395; Tender Amount: $10.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 959395

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00 AssessmentID 11767179

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AS TO SUBARU OF AMERICA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$410.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 951315; Tender Amount: $400.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 951315

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 8/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT / EXHIBIT A BUYER AGREEMENT / EXHIBIT B EXPRESS WARRANTY / EXHIBIT C REPAIR ORDERS / EXHIBIT D FURTHER WARRANTY ASSISTANCE REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED NOT ISSUED FEE NOT PAID - SUBARU OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND FOR BENJAMIN HARTMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 8/28/2021 - id number 2274240

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11753120

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCase 412021CC006528CCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 8/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CICHOWIC , RACHEL MONICA