This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 09/16/2020 at 14:56:35 (UTC).

BAYSHORE APARTMENTS OF MANATEE LP VS LOZANNE LOUIS Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 BAYSHORE APARTMENTS OF MANATEE LP filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against LOZANNE LOUIS. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT A FARRANCE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********22AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT A FARRANCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYSHORE APARTMENTS OF MANATEE LP

Defendants

ROSELIN VINCENT

LOZANNE LOUIS

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PAYMENT

02/10/2020 - REQUEST FOR PAYMENT

ORDER DISBURSING FUNDS FROM REGISTRY

02/05/2020 - ORDER DISBURSING FUNDS FROM REGISTRY

REQUEST FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS RETURNED FROM JUDGE

02/05/2020 - REQUEST FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS RETURNED FROM JUDGE

STIPULATION AND ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISBURSEMENT ORDER - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

01/31/2020 - STIPULATION AND ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISBURSEMENT ORDER - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

SUMMONS SERVED ROSELIN VINCENT 1-23-2020

01/24/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED ROSELIN VINCENT 1-23-2020

SUMMONS SERVED LOZANNE LOUIS 01-23-2020

01/24/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED LOZANNE LOUIS 01-23-2020

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/22/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

COMPLAINT

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT OF REGISTRY DEPOSIT PAYABLE TO BAYSHORE APARTMENTS OF MANATEE LP $975.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DISBURSING FUNDS FROM REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS RETURNED FROM JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISBURSEMENT ORDER - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:3 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$1,205.63; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797860; Tender Amount: $975.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:3 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$1,205.63; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797864; Tender Amount: $22.13;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED ROSELIN VINCENT 1-23-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED LOZANNE LOUIS 01-23-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM DEFENDANT - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketRECIEPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketPLEADING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:3 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$1,205.63; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797039; Tender Amount: $208.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketTHREE DAY NOTICE/APARTMENT LEASE CONTRACT ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO ROSELIN VINCENT/LOZANNE LOUIS 1/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EACH DEFENDANT- HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less