This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/19/2020 at 14:24:37 (UTC).

BAYSHORE APARTMENTS OF MANATEE LP VS DAVID HARRIS Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 BAYSHORE APARTMENTS OF MANATEE LP filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against DAVID HARRIS. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********27AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYSHORE APARTMENTS OF MANATEE LP

Defendants

DAVID HARRIS

TOME CARR

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

02/11/2020 - WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

02/03/2020 - FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

REQUEST FOR COURT DATE FORWARDED TO JUDGE

01/31/2020 - REQUEST FOR COURT DATE FORWARDED TO JUDGE

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

01/31/2020 - AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK/ DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK 01/31/2020

01/31/2020 - MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK/ DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK 01/31/2020

SUMMONS SERVED TOME CARR 1-23-2020

01/24/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED TOME CARR 1-23-2020

SUMMONS SERVED DAVID HARRIS 1-23-2020

01/24/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED DAVID HARRIS 1-23-2020

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/22/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

COMPLAINT

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED- CONTACTED PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM DEFENDANT FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COURT DATE FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketPLEADING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK/ DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED TOME CARR 1-23-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED DAVID HARRIS 1-23-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$208.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797038; Tender Amount: $208.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketTHREE DAY NOTICE/APARTMENT LEASE CONTRACT ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO DAVID HARIS/TOME CARR 1/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less