This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/19/2020 at 14:17:34 (UTC).

BAYSHORE APARTMENTS OF MANATEE III LP VS AKEEM RICHARDSON Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 BAYSHORE APARTMENTS OF MANATEE III LP filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against AKEEM RICHARDSON. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK D SINGER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********26AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MARK D SINGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYSHORE APARTMENTS OF MANATEE III LP

Defendants

AKEEM RICHARDSON

JENNIFER VERNET

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

02/11/2020 - WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

02/03/2020 - FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

01/31/2020 - AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK/ DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK 01/31/2020

01/31/2020 - MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK/ DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK 01/31/2020

SUMMONS POSTED AKEEM RICHARDSON 1-23-2020

01/24/2020 - SUMMONS POSTED AKEEM RICHARDSON 1-23-2020

SUMMONS POSTED JENNIFER VERNET 1-23-2020

01/24/2020 - SUMMONS POSTED JENNIFER VERNET 1-23-2020

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/22/2020 - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

COMPLAINT

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED- CONTACTED PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK/ DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK 01/31/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS POSTED AKEEM RICHARDSON 1-23-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS POSTED JENNIFER VERNET 1-23-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$208.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797036; Tender Amount: $208.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketTHREE DAY NOTICE/APARTMENT LEASE CONTRACT ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO AKEEM RICHARDSON/JENNIFER VERNET 1/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCONSENT TO CASE CLOSURE AFTER 90 DAYS OF INACTIVITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EACH DEFENDANT- HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less