Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 01/16/2021 at 13:41:29 (UTC).

BARBARA BERGSTROM VS DOLLAR TREE DISTRIBUTION INC

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 BARBARA BERGSTROM filed an Other lawsuit against DOLLAR TREE DISTRIBUTION INC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD NICHOLAS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********19AX

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD NICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARBARA BERGSTROM

Defendant

DOLLAR TREE DISTRIBUTION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASHLEY MARIE LONG

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

01/07/2021 - NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

12/18/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/19/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS SERVED DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC SEPTEMBER, 16 2020

09/21/2020 - AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS SERVED DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC SEPTEMBER, 16 2020

AMENDED COMPLAINT ESUMMONS ISSUED: DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC. 09-09-2020

09/02/2020 - AMENDED COMPLAINT ESUMMONS ISSUED: DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC. 09-09-2020

AMENDED COMPLAINT

09/02/2020 - AMENDED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS SERVED DOLLAR TREE DISTRIBUTION, INC AUGUST, 27 2020

09/01/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED DOLLAR TREE DISTRIBUTION, INC AUGUST, 27 2020

COMPLAINT

08/19/2020 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/19/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES DOLLAR TREE DISTRIBUTION, INC.

08/19/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES DOLLAR TREE DISTRIBUTION, INC.

ESUMMONS ISSUED: DOLLAR TREE DISTRIBUTION, INC., 08-20-2020

08/19/2020 - ESUMMONS ISSUED: DOLLAR TREE DISTRIBUTION, INC., 08-20-2020

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/19/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS SERVED DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC SEPTEMBER, 16 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$422.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 848551; Tender Amount: $10.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT ESUMMONS ISSUED: DOLLAR TREE STORES, INC. 09-09-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED DOLLAR TREE DISTRIBUTION, INC AUGUST, 27 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$422.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 845033; Tender Amount: $412.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES DOLLAR TREE DISTRIBUTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS ISSUED: DOLLAR TREE DISTRIBUTION, INC., 08-20-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dollar Tree Distribution, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LONG, ASHLEY