This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/05/2023 at 06:17:10 (UTC).

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON VS BANK OZK Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2022 BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BANK OZK. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD NICHOLAS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********72AX

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD NICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

Defendants

FIRST FEDERAL BANK

BANK OZK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEFFREY MICHAEL SEIDEN

Defendant Attorney

JANELLE LOUISE ESPOSITO

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR RE-FORECLOSURE

08/30/2022 - COMPLAINT FOR RE-FORECLOSURE

CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND ORDER

08/30/2022 - CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND ORDER

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED: FIRST FEDERAL BANK FKA FIRST FLORIDA BANK OF FLORIDA -- ISSUED 9/1/2022

08/30/2022 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED: FIRST FEDERAL BANK FKA FIRST FLORIDA BANK OF FLORIDA -- ISSUED 9/1/2022

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

08/30/2022 - VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/30/2022 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

08/30/2022 - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - E-FILED MORTGAGE

08/30/2022 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - E-FILED MORTGAGE

SUMMONS SERVED FIRST FEDERAL BANK FKA FIRST FEDERAL BANK OF FLORIDA AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO FLAGSHIP NATIONAL BANK, SEPTEMBER, 28 2022

10/06/2022 - SUMMONS SERVED FIRST FEDERAL BANK FKA FIRST FEDERAL BANK OF FLORIDA AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO FLAGSHIP NATIONAL BANK, SEPTEMBER, 28 2022

SUMMONS SERVED BANK OZK F/K/A BANK OF THE OZARKS, 9/28/2022

10/06/2022 - SUMMONS SERVED BANK OZK F/K/A BANK OF THE OZARKS, 9/28/2022

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT BANK OZK

10/14/2022 - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT BANK OZK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT AS TO FIRST FEDERAL BANK F/K/A FIRST FEDERAL BANK OF FLORIDA, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO FLAGSHIP NATIONAL BANKFIRST FEDERAL BANK, -ENTERED OCTOBER 27 2022

10/25/2022 - MOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT AS TO FIRST FEDERAL BANK F/K/A FIRST FEDERAL BANK OF FLORIDA, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO FLAGSHIP NATIONAL BANKFIRST FEDERAL BANK, -ENTERED OCTOBER 27 2022

MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF RE-FORECLOSURE AND ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS WOTH EXHIBIT 1- COPY OF NOTE

10/25/2022 - MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF RE-FORECLOSURE AND ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS WOTH EXHIBIT 1- COPY OF NOTE

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF HEARING - JANUARY 23 2023 9:45AM

11/16/2022 - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF HEARING - JANUARY 23 2023 9:45AM

AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS

10/25/2022 - AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS

NOTICE OF FILING REASONABLENESS AS TO ATTORNEYS FEES - BEST IMAGE AVAILABLE DUE TO POOR UPLOAD QUALITY OF DOCUMENT -

11/18/2022 - NOTICE OF FILING REASONABLENESS AS TO ATTORNEYS FEES - BEST IMAGE AVAILABLE DUE TO POOR UPLOAD QUALITY OF DOCUMENT -

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

01/23/2023 - FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

UNIFORM FINAL JUDGEMENT OF RE-FORECLOSURE - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

01/23/2023 - UNIFORM FINAL JUDGEMENT OF RE-FORECLOSURE - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $70.00 AssessmentID 12029770

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • JudgementAmount:: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNIFORM FINAL JUDGEMENT OF RE-FORECLOSURE - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING REASONABLENESS AS TO ATTORNEYS FEES - BEST IMAGE AVAILABLE DUE TO POOR UPLOAD QUALITY OF DOCUMENT -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF HEARING - JANUARY 23 2023 9:45AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF RE-FORECLOSURE AND ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS WOTH EXHIBIT 1- COPY OF NOTE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT / DEFAULT AS TO FIRST FEDERAL BANK F/K/A FIRST FEDERAL BANK OF FLORIDA, AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO FLAGSHIP NATIONAL BANKFIRST FEDERAL BANK, -ENTERED OCTOBER 27 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT BANK OZK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED ISSUED: FIRST FEDERAL BANK FKA FIRST FLORIDA BANK OF FLORIDA -- ISSUED 9/1/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT AND ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - E-FILED MORTGAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR RE-FORECLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 8/31/2022 - id number 2426436

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $1,905.00 AssessmentID 11956526

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CA003672CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 8/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less