This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/15/2020 at 13:37:27 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS WENDY LEA CYR

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed an Other lawsuit against WENDY LEA CYR. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********98AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

WENDY LEA CYR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONIQUE KRISTINE PARDO

 

Court Documents

ORDER ACCEPTING STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

04/14/2020 - ORDER ACCEPTING STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

SETILEMENT STIPULATION

04/08/2020 - SETILEMENT STIPULATION

SETTLEMENT STIPULATION

04/08/2020 - SETTLEMENT STIPULATION

MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT STIPULATION AND FOR ORDER DISMISSING CASE

04/08/2020 - MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT STIPULATION AND FOR ORDER DISMISSING CASE

SUMMONS SERVED WENDY LEA CYR ON 02/22/2020

02/24/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED WENDY LEA CYR ON 02/22/2020

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

02/18/2020 - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: WENDY LEA CYR - ISSUED 2/18/2020

02/18/2020 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: WENDY LEA CYR - ISSUED 2/18/2020

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/18/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ACCEPTING STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSETILEMENT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSETTLEMENT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT STIPULATION AND FOR ORDER DISMISSING CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION REVIEWED - NO ADDITIONAL ACTION REQUIRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketLETTER RESPONDING TO COURT SUMMONS - FORWARDED TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED WENDY LEA CYR ON 02/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$310.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 805880; Tender Amount: $310.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT ACCOUNT SUMMARY AND PAYMENT INFORMATION 12/07/2018 / ACCOUNT SUMMARY AND PAYMENT INFORMATION 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: WENDY LEA CYR - ISSUED 2/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less