This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/14/2020 at 09:59:57 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS RICARDO CENTENO

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RICARDO CENTENO. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********25AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

RICARDO CENTENO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORGE LUIS PALMA

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

01/21/2020 - MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

01/21/2020 - MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

01/21/2020 - ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

EX-PARTE ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO COMPLETE SERVICE OF PROCESS - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

01/21/2020 - EX-PARTE ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO COMPLETE SERVICE OF PROCESS - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

EX-PARTE MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO COMPLETE SERVICE OF PROCESS - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

01/21/2020 - EX-PARTE MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO COMPLETE SERVICE OF PROCESS - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

RETURN OF NON SERVICE AS TO RICARDO CENTENO - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

01/21/2020 - RETURN OF NON SERVICE AS TO RICARDO CENTENO - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

01/21/2020 - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$310.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 804436; Tender Amount: $310.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE PAID-PLEASE SUBMIT SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION REVIEWED - NO ADDITIONAL ACTION REQUIRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketBANK OF AMERICA STATEMENTS - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF NON SERVICE AS TO RICARDO CENTENO - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT TO APPEAR AND NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF RETURN ENVELOPE FOR NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX-PARTE ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO COMPLETE SERVICE OF PROCESS - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEX-PARTE MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO COMPLETE SERVICE OF PROCESS - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCOURT APPEARANCE RECORD - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketRECEIPT - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF PROGRESS DOCKET - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE - TRANSFER FROM SARASOTA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less