This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 10/03/2021 at 23:00:09 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS FELICIA V KENNEDY

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FELICIA. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MELISSA GOULD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********43AX

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MELISSA GOULD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

FELICIA V KENNEDY

Saint Petersburg, FL 33705

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JORGE LUIS PALMA

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING PLANTIFFS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE- TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

09/09/2021 - ORDER GRANTING PLANTIFFS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE- TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE- TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

09/09/2021 - MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE- TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES- TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

09/09/2021 - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES- TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

CIVIL COVER SHEET- TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

09/09/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET- TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

NON SERVICE RETURNED TO FELICIA KENNEDY- TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

09/09/2021 - NON SERVICE RETURNED TO FELICIA KENNEDY- TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$300.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 954158; Tender Amount: $300.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 954158

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 9/9/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCERTIFY COPY OF PROGRESS DOCKET - TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCERTIFY COPY ORDER GRANTING PLANTIFFS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE - TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT - TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLANTIFFS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE- TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE- TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketATTACHMENT OF BANK STATEMENTS ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT- TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES- TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET- TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT- TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON SERVICE RETURNED TO FELICIA KENNEDY- TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION- TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE TO FELICIA KENNEDY-TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 3/3/2021 AT 11:30AM- TRANSFER FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 9/10/2021 - id number 2278308

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00 AssessmentID 11758368

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketCase 412021SC006743SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 9/9/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Palma, Jorge L, ESQ.