This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 04/25/2023 at 04:00:44 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS BRYANNA BERGEMAN

Case Summary

On 01/31/2023 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BRYANNA BERGEMAN. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********06AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Defendant

BRYANNA BERGEMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JASON SCOTT DRAGUTSKY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/31/2023 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

01/31/2023 - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF COMPLAINT OF DAMAGES ACCOUNT SUMMARY/TRANSACTIONS

01/31/2023 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF COMPLAINT OF DAMAGES ACCOUNT SUMMARY/TRANSACTIONS

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO BRYANNA BERGEMAN 1/31/23

01/31/2023 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO BRYANNA BERGEMAN 1/31/23

SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVED/02-11-2023

02/13/2023 - SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVED/02-11-2023

DEFAULT

03/21/2023 - DEFAULT

AFFIDAVIT

04/12/2023 - AFFIDAVIT

COSTS DECLARATION

04/12/2023 - COSTS DECLARATION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

04/12/2023 - MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

NON-MILITARY DECLARATION

04/12/2023 - NON-MILITARY DECLARATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY DECLARATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOSTS DECLARATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • Hearing03/20/2023 at 09:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 4-E; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: DEFAULTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 3/20/2023 0900 AM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results DEFAULTED on 3/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING PLAINTIFF - PRESENT, REPRESENTED BY ROBERT HOFFMAN, ESQUIRE DEFENDANT - NOT PRESENT SERVED DEFAULT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00 AssessmentID 12038510

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVED/02-11-2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED TO BRYANNA BERGEMAN 1/31/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO STATEMENT OF COMPLAINT OF DAMAGES ACCOUNT SUMMARY/TRANSACTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1111066

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 1/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 3/20/2023 at 0900 AM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1505139

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 2/1/2023 - id number 2481465

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00 AssessmentID 12032151

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketCase 412023SC000606SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 1/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less