This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/21/2020 at 17:25:57 (UTC).

AUTO DEALER SOLUTIONS INC VS CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 AUTO DEALER SOLUTIONS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD NICHOLAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********25AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD NICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTO DEALER SOLUTIONS INC

Defendants

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON

CTR LAND LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL PATRICK MURPHY

Defendant Attorney

MATTHEW L LITSKY

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT UNDERWRITERS' REQUEST FOR ENTRY UPON LAND FOR INSPECTION

07/14/2020 - DEFENDANT UNDERWRITERS' REQUEST FOR ENTRY UPON LAND FOR INSPECTION

DEFENDANT UNDERWRITERS OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

07/09/2020 - DEFENDANT UNDERWRITERS OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT UNDERWRITERS' FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

07/06/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT UNDERWRITERS' FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/30/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

06/30/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

06/09/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

DEFENDANT, CTR LAND, LLC. NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF, AUTO DEALER SOLUTIONS, INC.

06/04/2020 - DEFENDANT, CTR LAND, LLC. NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF, AUTO DEALER SOLUTIONS, INC.

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING DEPOSITION JESSICA DUNHAM / BEN SHIVES 6/9/20

05/19/2020 - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING DEPOSITION JESSICA DUNHAM / BEN SHIVES 6/9/20

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S VERIFED RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT CTR LAND LLC'S INTERROGATORIES

05/04/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S VERIFED RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT CTR LAND LLC'S INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT, CTR LAND LLC.'S, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

03/04/2020 - DEFENDANT, CTR LAND LLC.'S, NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT, CTR LAND LLC'S, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

02/25/2020 - DEFENDANT, CTR LAND LLC'S, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND E-MAIL DESIGNATION - MATTHEW L. LITSKY, ESQ., SARAH J.M. SMITH, ESQ., AND HEATHER FRYMARK, ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT, CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON

02/21/2020 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND E-MAIL DESIGNATION - MATTHEW L. LITSKY, ESQ., SARAH J.M. SMITH, ESQ., AND HEATHER FRYMARK, ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT, CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON

CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT EXHIBIT A POLICY OF INSURANCE / SCHEDULE OF FORMS AND ENDORSEMENTS / CERTIFICATE PROVISIONS / CERTIFICATE OF INSURANCE / COM MERCIAL POLICY COVERAGE PART SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATIONS PARTICIPATION BY RESPECTIVE CONTRACT / SYNDICATE LIST / COMMON POLICY CONDITIONS / CLAIM REPORTING INFORMATION / SERVICE OF SUIT CLAUSE / APPLICABLE LAW / TERRORISM RISK INSURANCE ACT OF 2002 AS AMENDED NOT PURCHASED CLAUSE / SEVERAL LIABILITY NOTICE / LLOYD'S PRIVACY POLICY STATEMENT / ENDORSEMENT WAR AND CIVFL WAR EXCLUSION CLAUSE / CANCELLATION CLAUSE / ELECTRONIC DATA ENDORSEMENT B / TERRORISM EXCLUSION ENDORSEMENT / BIOLOGICAL OR CHEMICAL MATERIALS EXCLUSION / FLORIDA CHANGES / CANCELLATION AND NONRENEWAL / FLORIDA POLICYHOLDER NOTICE / MINIMUM EARNED PREMIUM ENDORSEMENT / WIND OR HAIL DEDUCTIBLE / BURGLARY AND ROBBERY PROTECTIVE SAFEGUARDS / EXISTING DAMAGE EXCLUSION ENDORSEMEIVT / BUILDING AND PERSONAL PROPERTY COVERAGE FORM / COMMERCIAL PROPERTY CONDITIONS / CAUSES OF LOSS SPECIAL FORM / WATER EXCLUSION ENDORSEMENT / THEFT EXCLUSION / EQUIPMENT BREAKDOWN COVERAGE FORM DECLARATIONS / EXHIBIT B CERTIFIED MAIL /

01/22/2020 - CIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT EXHIBIT A POLICY OF INSURANCE / SCHEDULE OF FORMS AND ENDORSEMENTS / CERTIFICATE PROVISIONS / CERTIFICATE OF INSURANCE / COM MERCIAL POLICY COVERAGE PART SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATIONS PARTICIPATION BY RESPECTIVE CONTRACT / SYNDICATE LIST / COMMON POLICY CONDITIONS / CLAIM REPORTING INFORMATION / SERVICE OF SUIT CLAUSE / APPLICABLE LAW / TERRORISM RISK INSURANCE ACT OF 2002 AS AMENDED NOT PURCHASED CLAUSE / SEVERAL LIABILITY NOTICE / LLOYD'S PRIVACY POLICY STATEMENT / ENDORSEMENT WAR AND CIVFL WAR EXCLUSION CLAUSE / CANCELLATION CLAUSE / ELECTRONIC DATA ENDORSEMENT B / TERRORISM EXCLUSION ENDORSEMENT / BIOLOGICAL OR CHEMICAL MATERIALS EXCLUSION / FLORIDA CHANGES / CANCELLATION AND NONRENEWAL / FLORIDA POLICYHOLDER NOTICE / MINIMUM EARNED PREMIUM ENDORSEMENT / WIND OR HAIL DEDUCTIBLE / BURGLARY AND ROBBERY PROTECTIVE SAFEGUARDS / EXISTING DAMAGE EXCLUSION ENDORSEMEIVT / BUILDING AND PERSONAL PROPERTY COVERAGE FORM / COMMERCIAL PROPERTY CONDITIONS / CAUSES OF LOSS SPECIAL FORM / WATER EXCLUSION ENDORSEMENT / THEFT EXCLUSION / EQUIPMENT BREAKDOWN COVERAGE FORM DECLARATIONS / EXHIBIT B CERTIFIED MAIL /

SUMMONS SERVED LLOYDS LONDON, SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO:567366R2 - 02/11/2020

02/14/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED LLOYDS LONDON, SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO:567366R2 - 02/11/2020

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: CTR LAND LLC -- ISSUED 1/23/2020

01/22/2020 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: CTR LAND LLC -- ISSUED 1/23/2020

CIVIL COVER SHEET 2

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET 2

COMPLAINT

01/22/2020 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/22/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT UNDERWRITERS' REQUEST FOR ENTRY UPON LAND FOR INSPECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT UNDERWRITERS OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT UNDERWRITERSNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT UNDERWRITERS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT UNDERWRITERS' FIRST REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT UNDERWRITERS' FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION JESSICA DUNHAM 7/24/20 1:00 P.M. / BEN SHIVES 7/24/20 3:00 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD LONDON, SUBCRIBING TO POLICY NUMBER 567336R2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT CTR LAND LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT, CTR LAND LLC'S, ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND E-MAIL DESIGNATION - MATTHEW L. LITSKY, ESQ., SARAH J.M. SMITH, ESQ., AND HEATHER FRYMARK, ESQ. OBO DEFENDANT, CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S, LONDON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED LLOYDS LONDON, SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO:567366R2 - 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$420.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797106; Tender Amount: $420.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT EXHIBIT A POLICY OF INSURANCE / SCHEDULE OF FORMS AND ENDORSEMENTS / CERTIFICATE PROVISIONS / CERTIFICATE OF INSURANCE / COM MERCIAL POLICY COVERAGE PART SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATIONS PARTICIPATION BY RESPECTIVE CONTRACT / SYNDICATE LIST / COMMON POLICY CONDITIONS / CLAIM REPORTING INFORMATION / SERVICE OF SUIT CLAUSE / APPLICABLE LAW / TERRORISM RISK INSURANCE ACT OF 2002 AS AMENDED NOT PURCHASED CLAUSE / SEVERAL LIABILITY NOTICE / LLOYD'S PRIVACY POLICY STATEMENT / ENDORSEMENT WAR AND CIVFL WAR EXCLUSION CLAUSE / CANCELLATION CLAUSE / ELECTRONIC DATA ENDORSEMENT B / TERRORISM EXCLUSION ENDORSEMENT / BIOLOGICAL OR CHEMICAL MATERIALS EXCLUSION / FLORIDA CHANGES / CANCELLATION AND NONRENEWAL / FLORIDA POLICYHOLDER NOTICE / MINIMUM EARNED PREMIUM ENDORSEMENT / WIND OR HAIL DEDUCTIBLE / BURGLARY AND ROBBERY PROTECTIVE SAFEGUARDS / EXISTING DAMAGE EXCLUSION ENDORSEMEIVT / BUILDING AND PERSONAL PROPERTY COVERAGE FORM / COMMERCIAL PROPERTY CONDITIONS / CAUSES OF LOSS SPECIAL FORM / WATER EXCLUSION ENDORSEMENT / THEFT EXCLUSION / EQUIPMENT BREAKDOWN COVERAGE FORM DECLARATIONS / EXHIBIT B CERTIFIED MAIL /

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: LLOYDS LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO POLICY NO: 567366R2 -- ISSUED 1/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: CTR LAND LLC -- ISSUED 1/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less