This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/22/2021 at 13:02:01 (UTC).

ASHLEY JEAN NOE VS GARY WAYNE NOE

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 ASHLEY JEAN NOE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GARY WAYNE NOE. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TERI K DEES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********74AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TERI K DEES

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ASHLEY JEAN NOE

Bradenton, FL 34209

Respondent

GARY WAYNE NOE

Bradenton, FL 34209

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL HEARING MARCH 8, 2021 @ 1:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketTWELFTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT FAMILY DIVISION RULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE-HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$397.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 886282; Tender Amount: $397.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER FOR MANATEE, SARASOTA AND DESOTO COUNTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketTWELFTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT FAMILY DIVISION RULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE-WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM) AND MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketBUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS INFORMATION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER-HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER- WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED-WIFE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED-HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less