This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 01/24/2023 at 04:56:39 (UTC).

ASHLEY GRIMES, MARK A GRIMES Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 ASHLEY GRIMES, MARK A GRIMES was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********18AX

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Decedent

MARK A GRIMES

Parrish, FL 34219

Not Yet Classified

ASHLEY GRIMES

Englewood, FL 34223

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

BENJAMIN RAY HUNTER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type CP INVENTORY DUE was satisfied with Compliance Action - COMPLETED set on 8/17/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 3 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $407.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1035858; Tender Amount: $400.00; Receipt Number: 1054980; Tender Amount: $3.50; Receipt Number: 1079881; Tender Amount: $3.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1079881

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $3.50 AssessmentID 11978268

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - AT&T MOBILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM DCM SERVICES ON BEHALF OF AT&T MOBILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketINVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION / NOTICE TO CREDITORS - 7/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 3 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $407.00; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1035858; Tender Amount: $400.00; Receipt Number: 1054980; Tender Amount: $3.50; Receipt Number: 1079881; Tender Amount: $3.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1035858

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - SENT TO PROBATE COORDINATOR 06/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCHECKLIST: OPENING FORMAL ADMINISTRATION TESTATE ESTATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT: ASHLEY GRIMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF DEATH: MARK A GRIMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11901523

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CP001618CPAXMA Filed with Clerk on 5/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less