This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/13/2020 at 15:45:47 (UTC).

ASHLEIGH MORGAN GREGORIA DEWAAL

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 ASHLEIGH MORGAN GREGORIA DEWAAL was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********87AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ASHLEIGH MORGAN GREGORIA DEWAAL

Bradenton, FL 34201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RIC GREGORIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • Hearing02/27/2020 at 09:30AM - JACS-NAME CHANGE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 3-E; Judge: MORELAND, DIANA L;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT)RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING - FEBRUARY 27, 2020 AT 9:30 A.M. (5 MINUTES RESERVED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$400.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797873; Tender Amount: $400.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME (ADULT)

    Read MoreRead Less