This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/29/2020 at 04:32:33 (UTC).

ANTHEA ROSEMARY CLOSE, ANTHEA ROSEMARY CLOSE TRUST Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 ANTHEA ROSEMARY CLOSE, ANTHEA ROSEMARY CLOSE TRUST was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DENO G ECONOMOU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********93AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DENO G ECONOMOU

 

Party Details

Petitioner, Not Yet Classified and Trustee

JULIAN CHRISTOPHER GRUMLEY

Bradenton, FL 34207

Not Yet Classified and Trustees

ANTHEA ROSEMARY CLOSE TRUST

JULIAN CHRISTOPHER GRUMLEY

Bradenton, FL 34207

Decedent

ANTHEA ROSEMARY CLOSE

Bradenton, FL 34209

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

DAVID CHASTAIN AGEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketORDER TO CORRECT DEFICIENCIES - INV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF ANTHEA ROSEMARY CLOSE,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION - 1/31/2020 - NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF ANTHEA ROSEMARY CLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketWILL FOR DEPOSIT/ INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION REVIEWED - NO ADDITIONAL ACTION REQUIRED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT - EMMA LOUISE OAKDEN,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT - MARIA ANNE GRUMLEY,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED - ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - SENT TO PROBATE COORDINATOR IN AM RUN ON 1/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT - AMANDA JANE OAKDEN,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF DEATH - II' ANTHEA ROSEMARY CLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT - JULIAN CHRISTOPHER GRUMLEY,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less