This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 07/21/2020 at 09:25:26 (UTC).

ANDREW WHIDDEN VS BIANCA WHIDDEN

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 ANDREW WHIDDEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BIANCA WHIDDEN. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********27AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANDREW WHIDDEN

Bradenton, FL 34202

Respondent

BIANCA WHIDDEN

Bradenton, FL 34202

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$408.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 834785; Tender Amount: $10.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH MINOR CHILD(REN) (UNCONTESTED)-RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING DATE: JUNE 29, 2020 TIME: 2:30 P.M. VIA ZOOM VIDEO CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketSECOND AMENDED FINAL HEARING LETTER FROM CASE MANAGER JUNE 29, 2020 AT 1:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketAMENDED THE HEARING SCHEDULED ON MRCH 24.2020 IS CANCELLED - RE-SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 20.2020 AT 1;30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL HEARING MARCH 24, 2020 AT 1:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL HEARING MARCH 24, 2020 AT 1:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$408.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 797127; Tender Amount: $397.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPARENTING PLAN- ANDREW WHIDDEN, BIANCA WHIDDEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER FOR MANATEE, SARASOTA AND DESTO COUNTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketVITAL STATISTICS FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketMINOR CHILD QUESTIONNAIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketDISCLOSURE FROM NONLAWYER- ANDREW WHIDDEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSTATE APPROVED PARENTING EDUCATION AND FAMILY STABILIZATION CLASS COMPLETION CERTIFICATE- ANDREW WHIDDEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNONMILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER- BIANCA WHIDDEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER- ANDREW WHIDDEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketSTATE APPROVED PARENTING EDUCATION AND FAMILY STABILIZATION CLASS COMPLETION CERTIFICATE- BIANCA WHIDDEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketFORM A

    Read MoreRead Less