This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/12/2020 at 14:06:33 (UTC).

ANDREW PHILIP SMITH VS FLORIDA CITRUS MANAGEMENT INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/16/2020 ANDREW PHILIP SMITH filed an Other lawsuit against FLORIDA CITRUS MANAGEMENT INC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD NICHOLAS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********08AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD NICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANDREW PHILIP SMITH

Defendants

FLORIDA CITRUS MANAGEMENT INC

ROBERT WILSON WINFREE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARC MATTHEWS

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING VERIFIED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYSFEE CONTRACT

04/07/2020 - ORDER APPROVING VERIFIED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYSFEE CONTRACT

AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYSFEE CONTRACT

01/21/2020 - AMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYSFEE CONTRACT

VERIFIED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEE CONTRACT

01/16/2020 - VERIFIED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEE CONTRACT

NOTICE OF HEARING - APRIL 1, 2020 9:45 A.M.

02/11/2020 - NOTICE OF HEARING - APRIL 1, 2020 9:45 A.M.

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/16/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPROVING VERIFIED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYSFEE CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • Hearing04/01/2020 at 09:45AM - JACS-OTHER MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 6-E; Judge: NICHOLAS, EDWARD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING - APRIL 1, 2020 9:45 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - APRIL 1, 2020 9:45 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUE - GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$0.00; Total Voided Amount:($400.00); Receipt Number: 796602; Tender Amount: $400.00; Voided Amount: ($400.00); Voided: Voided;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED VERIFIED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYSFEE CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVERIFIED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEE CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED APPLICATION FOR DETERIAL NATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less