This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/11/2022 at 21:49:44 (UTC).

ANA LUCIC, ANDELKA LUCIC Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 ANA LUCIC, ANDELKA LUCIC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********30AX

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

 

Party Details

Appellants

MIRJANA LUCIC

ANA LUCIC

ANDELKA LUCIC

Appellee

INTERNATIONAL MERCHANDISING CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

BRANDON STUART VESELY

Appellee Attorney

CECI CULPEPPER BERMAN

 

Court Documents

RECORD ON APPEAL COMPLETED, SUBMITTED ELECTRONIC TO THE DISTRICT COURT, AND COPY OF INDEX EMAILED TO PARTIES

10/18/2021 - RECORD ON APPEAL COMPLETED, SUBMITTED ELECTRONIC TO THE DISTRICT COURT, AND COPY OF INDEX EMAILED TO PARTIES

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$2,907.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 990806; Tender Amount: $2,807.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 990806

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $7.00 AssessmentID 11779280

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $2,800.00 AssessmentID 11779279

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECORD ON APPEAL COMPLETED, SUBMITTED ELECTRONIC TO THE DISTRICT COURT, AND COPY OF INDEX EMAILED TO PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:2 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$2,907.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 952014; Tender Amount: $100.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL TRANSMITTED TO THE DISTRICT COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 952014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $100.00 AssessmentID 11754178

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCase 412021AP000130ACAXMA Filed with Clerk on 8/31/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less