This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 20:37:38 (UTC).

AMY LEIGH WISE VS MARY SUSAN LAW

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 AMY LEIGH WISE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARY SUSAN LAW. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********96AX

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMY LEIGH WISE

Defendant

MARY SUSAN LAW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIMOTHY MALCOLM FARROW

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MEDIATION THURSDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2020 @ 9:30 AM

06/19/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MEDIATION THURSDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2020 @ 9:30 AM

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

05/27/2020 - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR COPIES

04/16/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMY L WISE

04/08/2020 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMY L WISE

NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

04/07/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR COPIES

04/06/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR COPIES

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

03/12/2020 - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

02/19/2020 - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - DEFENDANT, MARY SUSAN LAW, RESPONDS TO PLAINTIFF, AMY LEIGH WISE'S COMPLAINT

02/18/2020 - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - DEFENDANT, MARY SUSAN LAW, RESPONDS TO PLAINTIFF, AMY LEIGH WISE'S COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/18/2020 - PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SUMMONS SERVED MARY SUSAN LAW, JANUARY, 24 2020

02/05/2020 - SUMMONS SERVED MARY SUSAN LAW, JANUARY, 24 2020

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: MARY SUSAN LAW - ISSUED 12/23/2019

12/20/2019 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: MARY SUSAN LAW - ISSUED 12/23/2019

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/20/2019 - COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, MARY SUSAN LAW

12/20/2019 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, MARY SUSAN LAW

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/20/2019 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MEDIATION COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MEDIATION THURSDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2020 @ 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL INVENTORY AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF INTENT TO SUBPOENA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMY L WISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S INVENTORY AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - DEFENDANT, MARY SUSAN LAW, RESPONDS TO PLAINTIFF, AMY LEIGH WISE'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SERVED MARY SUSAN LAW, JANUARY, 24 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$410.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 788185; Tender Amount: $410.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: MARY SUSAN LAW - ISSUED 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT MARY SUSAN LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, MARY SUSAN LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less