This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 04/07/2023 at 18:04:14 (UTC).

AMY L REILLY VS NATHAN REILLY

Case Summary

On 01/18/2023 AMY L REILLY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NATHAN REILLY. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TERI K DEES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********58AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TERI K DEES

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AMY L REILLY

Respondent

NATHAN REILLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROBERT J HOFFMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.50 AssessmentID 12069514

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Hearing04/03/2023 at 09:30AM - JACS-FINAL HEARING; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: CASKEY, DAVID P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketORDER ADOPTING AND APPROVING MAGISTRATE'S RECOMMENDED ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE- RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS ON 04/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketPETITIONER'S NOTICE OF FILING FLORIDA DRIVER'S LICENSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING VIA ZOOM -SET FOR APRIL 3, 2023 AT 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketANSWER WAIVER, AND RI JUEST FOR COPY OF DISSOLUTION OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketPETITIONER'S NOTICE OF FILING MARITAL SEPARATION AND PROPERTY SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT WITH NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • FinancialTotal Receipts: 1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount: $407.50; Total Voided Amount: $0.00; Receipt Number: 1107060; Tender Amount: $407.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1107060

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 1/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketSUMMONS SUBMITTED TO THE CLERK ISSUED TO NATHAN REILLY 1/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) OR PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 1/19/2023 - id number 2476566

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $397.50 AssessmentID 12024752

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCase 412023DR000258DRAXMA Filed with Clerk on 1/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less