This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 11/25/2022 at 13:32:14 (UTC).

AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY Et Al VS JACKOLINE FLETCHER-GOODE

Case Summary

On 09/26/2022 AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against JACKOLINE FLETCHER-GOODE. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENEE INMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********72AX

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENEE INMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY

JOHN LOEWENSTEIN

Defendant

JACKOLINE FLETCHER-GOODE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENJAMIN J LEFRANCOIS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/26/2022 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

PROPERTY DAMAGE SUBROGATION COMPLAINT

09/26/2022 - PROPERTY DAMAGE SUBROGATION COMPLAINT

SUMMONS PERSONAL SERVICE ON A NATURAL PERSON ISSUED TO JACKOLINE C, FLETCHER-GOODE, ON 9/27/2022

09/26/2022 - SUMMONS PERSONAL SERVICE ON A NATURAL PERSON ISSUED TO JACKOLINE C, FLETCHER-GOODE, ON 9/27/2022

SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVED/JACKOLINE C FLETCHER-GOODE/10-19-2022

10/21/2022 - SUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVED/JACKOLINE C FLETCHER-GOODE/10-19-2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketLETTER FROM DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketPLEADING FILED BY DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SUBSTITUTE SERVED/JACKOLINE C FLETCHER-GOODE/10-19-2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$310.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 1075284; Tender Amount: $310.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCOPY OF STANDING ORDER FOR COUNTY COURT CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS PERSONAL SERVICE ON A NATURAL PERSON ISSUED TO JACKOLINE C, FLETCHER-GOODE, ON 9/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPERTY DAMAGE SUBROGATION COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 1075284

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 9/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 9/27/2022 - id number 2437673

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00 AssessmentID 11970277

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CC005672CCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 9/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMCO INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lefrancois, Benjamin J