Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/03/2020 at 13:00:43 (UTC).

AMANDA E HYNDS VS JEFFRY D TAILLON

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 AMANDA E HYNDS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JEFFRY D TAILLON. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********07AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN MATHEW WHYTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AMANDA E HYNDS

Respondent

JEFFRY D TAILLON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JAMES DAVID CARTER JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • Hearing02/27/2020 at 02:00PM - JACS-MULTIPLE MOTIONS; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: HEARING ROOM #1 - 3RD FLOOR; Judge: HUDSON, PAUL;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING THURSDAY, FEBRUARY 27, 2020 2:00 P.M. 3RD FLOOR, HEARING ROOM 1, MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$397.50; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 794613; Tender Amount: $397.50;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT/TRANSFER TO THE UNFIIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - AMANDA E. HYNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketVERIFIED PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT - AMANDA HYNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR TEMPORARY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARTER, JAMES DAVID JR