Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 04/11/2021 at 18:00:20 (UTC).

ALVIN L MILNER, KAREN BOUTELL Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 ALVIN L MILNER, KAREN BOUTELL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********00AX

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KAREN BOUTELL

Shelby, MI 49455

Decedent

ALVIN L MILNER

Bradenton, FL 34212

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DANA LAGANELLA GERLING

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF ALVIN L. MILNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$400.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 903132; Tender Amount: $400.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF DEATH - ALVIN L MILNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE - FORWARDED TO PROBATE COORDINATOR FOR REVIEW 3/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GERLING, DANA