This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 06/06/2023 at 16:05:47 (UTC).

ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY VS CONRAD STEARNS Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/08/2022 ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against CONRAD STEARNS. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHARLES SNIFFEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********74AX

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHARLES SNIFFEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALLIED WORLD ASSURANCE COMPANY

NATIONAL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

AXIS SURPLUS INSURANCE COMPANY

WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INDEPENDENT SPECIALTY IN

INDEPENDENT SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

INTERSTATE FIRE AND MARINE CASUALTY COMPANY

PRINCETON EXCESS AND SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPA

GENERAL SECURITY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF ARIZONA

CRUM AND FORSTER SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

WESTERN WORLD INSURANCE COMPANY

ARGO RE LTD

EVEREST INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

MANATEE COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

Defendants

RING POWER CORPORATION

CONRAD STEARNS

STEARNS CONRAD AND SCHMIDT CONSULTING ENGINEERS IN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MATTHEW WESTON PEAIRE

Defendant Attorneys

DAVIS DANIEL BALZ

LOREN H COHEN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF MATT RABIL

05/24/2023 - NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF MATT RABIL

RING POWER'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION

05/18/2023 - RING POWER'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

05/16/2023 - NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

DEFENDANT'S STEARNS, CONRAD AND SCHMIDT, CONSULTING ENGINEERS, INC., D/B/A SCS FIELD SERVICES AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/14/2023 - DEFENDANT'S STEARNS, CONRAD AND SCHMIDT, CONSULTING ENGINEERS, INC., D/B/A SCS FIELD SERVICES AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF HEARING JUNE 1 2023 1:30PM VIA ZOOM

04/10/2023 - NOTICE OF HEARING JUNE 1 2023 1:30PM VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 4/3/2023

03/30/2023 - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 4/3/2023

DEFENDANT RING POWER CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/29/2023 - DEFENDANT RING POWER CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEFENDANT RING POWER CORPORATION'S AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

03/27/2023 - DEFENDANT RING POWER CORPORATION'S AMENDED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

AGREED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE VARIOUS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ALLEGED BY STEARNS CONRAD AND SCHMIDT CONSULTING ENGINEERS INC D/B/A SCS FIELDSERVICES IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT

03/24/2023 - AGREED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE VARIOUS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ALLEGED BY STEARNS CONRAD AND SCHMIDT CONSULTING ENGINEERS INC D/B/A SCS FIELDSERVICES IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2023
  • Hearing06/01/2023 at 01:30PM - JACS-COMPEL; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SNIFFEN, CHARLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF MATT RABIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRING POWER'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE (AMENDING DUE TO SCRIVENER'S ERROR REGARDING DATE) ON MONDAY, JUNE 19, 2023, AT 9:00 A.M. VIA ZOOM. MEDIATOR PAUL SHOUCAIR, ESQ.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S STEARNS, CONRAD AND SCHMIDT, CONSULTING ENGINEERS, INC., D/B/A SCS FIELD SERVICES AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING JUNE 1 2023 1:30PM VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • Hearing04/04/2023 at 09:00AM - JACS-STRIKE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SNIFFEN, CHARLES; Result: CANCELLED-JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Hearing04/03/2023 at 09:00AM - JACS-STRIKE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SNIFFEN, CHARLES; Result: CANCELLED-JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO RING POWER CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF SERVICE FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO STEARNS, CONRAD AND SCHMIDT, CONSULTING ENGINEERS, INC, D/B/A SCS FIELD SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF SERVICE FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO RING POWER CORPORATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS SUBMITTED TO BE ISSUED - RING POWER CORPORATION / STEARNS, CONRAD AND SCHMIDT, CONSULTING ENGINEERS, INC. D/B/A SCS FIELD SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT - EXHIBIT A CONTRACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 9/9/2022 - id number 2429517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 AssessmentID 11960569

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketCase 412022CA003774CAAXMA Filed with Clerk on 9/8/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less