This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/23/2021 at 18:09:56 (UTC).

ALINE LANE LECKIE, DILINA KAY GADDIS Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2021 ALINE LANE LECKIE, DILINA KAY GADDIS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********05AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DILINA KAY GADDIS

Melbourne, FL 32940

Decedent

ALINE LANE LECKIE

Palmetto, FL 34221

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MICHAEL BRANDON ROBINSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF ALINE LECKIE - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ZOOM HEARING - DATE: FEBRUARY 10, 2021 - TIME: 8:30 A.M., - MATTER TO BE HEARD: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF ALINE LECKIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$345.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 886503; Tender Amount: $345.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATION OF DEATH - ALINE LANE LECKIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE - FORWARDED TO PROBATE COORDINATOR 01/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT BY MARK ANTHONY PAYNE TO PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL BRANDON ROBINSON