Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 02/06/2020 at 11:00:23 (UTC).

ALIDA BARRIOS VELASQUEZ VS SANTIAGO RUIZ

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 ALIDA BARRIOS VELASQUEZ filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against SANTIAGO RUIZ. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********66AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALIDA BARRIOS VELASQUEZ

Palmetto, FL 34221

Respondent

SANTIAGO RUIZ

Bradenton, FL 34203

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

NATORIA D HUBBARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • Hearing02/05/2020 at 01:30PM - INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 3-E; Judge: MORELAND, DIANA L;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DATING VIOLENCE (SENT TO SAO PER JUDGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketINJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION CHECKLIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE: NATORIA D. HUBBARD, ESQ ON BEHALF OF PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCONSENT TO LIMITED APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR THE PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ATTORNEY'S PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DATING VIOLENCE - SERVED 1/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DATING VIOLENCE (SENT TO MSO FOR SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO PETITION ( PHOTOS OF INJURIES ON THE LIP AND LEFT EYE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPETITIONER'S WAIVER OR NON-WAIVER OF RETURN HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketRULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DATING VIOLENCE (SENT TO JUDGE FOR REVIEW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketLAW ENFORCEMENT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NATORIA D HUBBARD