This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 01/22/2023 at 14:31:29 (UTC).

ALEXANDRE JEAN JULME VS DEAL NATASHA MARIE

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 ALEXANDRE JEAN JULME filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DEAL NATASHA MARIE. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIELLE L BREWER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********30AX

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANIELLE L BREWER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALEXANDRE JEAN JULME

Respondent

DEAL NATASHA MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

ROBERT J HOFFMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • Hearing09/06/2022 at 10:15AM - JACS-DISMISS; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: BREWER, DANIELLE L; Result: CANCELLED-JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • Hearing07/28/2022 at 09:45AM - JACS-DISMISS; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 3-D; Judge: BREWER, DANIELLE L; Result: CANCELLED-JACS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING TO CONDUCTED ON ZOOM PLATFORM 09/06/2022 10:15AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNOTICE CANCELLATION OF HEARING TO BE CONDUCTED ON ZOOM PLATFORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING JULY 28, 2022 @ 9:45AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketSHERIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WITH ATTACHED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDEFAULT NOT ENTERED RESPONDENT FILED MOTION TO DISMISS ON 05/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT PETITIONER (TRANSFERRED FROM SARASOTA COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE PETITIONER (TRANSFERRED FROM SARASOTA COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketPROCESS SERVICE MEMORANDUM (TRANSFERRED FROM SARASOTA COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS )(TRANSFERRED FROM SARASOTA COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCOPY OF SARASOTA COUNTY RECEIPT OF TRANSACTION (TRANSFERRED FROM SARASOTA COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCOPY OF SUMMONS ISSUED TO NATASHA DEAL (TRANSFERRED FROM SARASOTA COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) OR PROPERTY (TRANSFERRED FROM SARASOTA COUNTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 4/23/2022 - id number 2372604

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $397.50 AssessmentID 11885123

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCase 412022DR001630DRAXMA Filed with Clerk on 4/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less