**********30AX
04/22/2022
Disposed - Other Disposed
Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce
Manatee, Florida
DANIELLE L BREWER
ALEXANDRE JEAN JULME
DEAL NATASHA MARIE
ROBERT J HOFFMAN
Court documents are not available for this case.
Hearing09/06/2022 at 10:15AM - JACS-DISMISS; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: BREWER, DANIELLE L; Result: CANCELLED-JACS
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
[-] Read LessHearing07/28/2022 at 09:45AM - JACS-DISMISS; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: COURTROOM 3-D; Judge: BREWER, DANIELLE L; Result: CANCELLED-JACS
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE OF HEARING TO CONDUCTED ON ZOOM PLATFORM 09/06/2022 10:15AM
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE CANCELLATION OF HEARING TO BE CONDUCTED ON ZOOM PLATFORM
[-] Read LessDocketNOTICE OF HEARING JULY 28, 2022 @ 9:45AM
[-] Read LessDocketSHERIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE WITH ATTACHED SUMMONS
[-] Read LessDocketDEFAULT NOT ENTERED RESPONDENT FILED MOTION TO DISMISS ON 05/16/2022
[-] Read LessDocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT
[-] Read LessDocketFAMILY FORM A
[-] Read LessDocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT PETITIONER (TRANSFERRED FROM SARASOTA COUNTY)
[-] Read LessDocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE PETITIONER (TRANSFERRED FROM SARASOTA COUNTY)
[-] Read LessDocketPROCESS SERVICE MEMORANDUM (TRANSFERRED FROM SARASOTA COUNTY)
[-] Read LessDocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS )(TRANSFERRED FROM SARASOTA COUNTY)
[-] Read LessDocketCOPY OF SARASOTA COUNTY RECEIPT OF TRANSACTION (TRANSFERRED FROM SARASOTA COUNTY)
[-] Read LessDocketCOPY OF SUMMONS ISSUED TO NATASHA DEAL (TRANSFERRED FROM SARASOTA COUNTY)
[-] Read LessDocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) OR PROPERTY (TRANSFERRED FROM SARASOTA COUNTY)
[-] Read LessDocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 4/23/2022 - id number 2372604
[-] Read LessDocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $397.50 AssessmentID 11885123
[-] Read LessDocketCase 412022DR001630DRAXMA Filed with Clerk on 4/22/2022
[-] Read Less