This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/14/2020 at 16:48:17 (UTC).

ALEX BUSZNYAK VS MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 ALEX BUSZNYAK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD NICHOLAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********90AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EDWARD NICHOLAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEX BUSZNYAK

Defendant

MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHRISTOPHER ERIC FROHLICH

Defendant Attorney

PAUL ANGELO BERNARDINI JR

 

Court Documents

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE (ZOOM) AUGUST 25, 2020 AT 9:45 AM DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION

07/17/2020 - AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE (ZOOM) AUGUST 25, 2020 AT 9:45 AM DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF HEARING AUGUST 25, 2020 AT 9:45 AM

07/17/2020 - NOTICE OF HEARING AUGUST 25, 2020 AT 9:45 AM

RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

07/16/2020 - RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S NON-PARTY SUBPOENAS AND INTENTION TO USE MDA RECORDS RETRIEVAL, INC.

06/25/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S NON-PARTY SUBPOENAS AND INTENTION TO USE MDA RECORDS RETRIEVAL, INC.

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ALEX BUZSNYAK AUGUST 24 AT 1:00 P.M.

06/12/2020 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ALEX BUZSNYAK AUGUST 24 AT 1:00 P.M.

NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

06/03/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

04/13/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S COLLATERAL SOURCE REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/13/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S COLLATERAL SOURCE REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RETURN OF SERVICE - MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA - SUMMONS (SERVED) FEBRUARY 25, 2020

03/26/2020 - RETURN OF SERVICE - MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA - SUMMONS (SERVED) FEBRUARY 25, 2020

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

03/10/2020 - NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA,

03/10/2020 - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA,

ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA - ISSUED 2/14/2020

02/13/2020 - ESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA - ISSUED 2/14/2020

COMPLAINT

02/13/2020 - COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES ON DEFENDANT

02/13/2020 - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES ON DEFENDANT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/13/2020 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2020
  • Hearing08/25/2020 at 09:45AM - JACS-OTHER MOTION; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: NICHOLAS, EDWARD;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE (ZOOM) AUGUST 25, 2020 AT 9:45 AM DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF NON-PARTY PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING AUGUST 25, 2020 AT 9:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY- AFFIDAVIT DAVID SCHULZ. OBO MDA RECORDS I-CTETRIEVAL, I NC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT DAVID SCHULZ. OBO MDA RECORDS R,,ETRIEVAL, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S NON-PARTY SUBPOENAS AND INTENTION TO USE MDA RECORDS RETRIEVAL, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ALEX BUZSNYAK AUGUST 24 AT 1:00 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS OF NON-PARTIES YOLANDA WATSON AUGUST 24, 2020 2:30 P.M. // ROGER KEYT AUGUST 24, 2020 3:00 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$410.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 804942; Tender Amount: $410.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCIVIL ATTACHMENT TO COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT A STATEMENT UNDER OATH FROM MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA DATED FEBRUARY 5, 2019 / AFFIDAVIT / AUTO INSURANCE POLICY DECLARATIONS / UNINSURED MOTORIST COVERAGE ANNUAL OPTIONS FORM / AUTOMOBILE APPLICATION / PERSONAL INJURY PROTECTION COVERAGE / PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT B CIVIL REMEDY NOTICE OF INSURER VIOLATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 OF THE FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES ON DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketESUMMONS SUBMITTED TO CLERK ISSUED: MERCURY INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA - ISSUED 2/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mercury Indemnity Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERNARDINI , PAUL ANGELO, Jr