Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 08/03/2020 at 13:19:51 (UTC).

ALBERTO MESA VS DENISSE C. LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 01/14/2020 ALBERTO MESA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DENISSE C LOPEZ. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA L MORELAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********26AX

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA L MORELAND

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALBERTO MESA

Bradenton, FL 34205

Respondent

DENISSE C. LOPEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF POSTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE EXPIRED FROM THE BORAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNEEDS LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY - ALBERTO MESA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER FOR MANATEE, SARASOTA AND DESOTO COUNTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (SHORT FORM)- ALBERTO MESA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) OR PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE- ALBERTO MESA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE- ALBERTO MESA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketTWELFTH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT FAMILY DIVISION RULES OF COURTROOM ETIQUETTE- ALBERTO MESA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER- ALBERTO MESA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION FOR DISSOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCOVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDI(ENT STATUS- GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED- ALERTO MESA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF NO RELATED CASE FOR JUDGE ASSIGNMENT / TRANSFER TO THE UNIFIED FAMILY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketFAMILY FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less