This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 10/22/2021 at 08:16:30 (UTC).

ALBERTO DOMINGUEZ Et Al VS MGA INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 08/24/2021 ALBERTO DOMINGUEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MGA INSURANCE COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MELISSA GOULD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********31AX

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MELISSA GOULD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC

ALBERTO DOMINGUEZ

Defendant

MGA INSURANCE COMPANY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANTHONY D BARAK

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

10/07/2021 - NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 8/30/2021 AS TO MGA INSURANCE COMPANY INC

08/24/2021 - NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 8/30/2021 AS TO MGA INSURANCE COMPANY INC

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

08/24/2021 - PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

COMPLAINT

08/24/2021 - COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/24/2021 - CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event PTC on 10/4/2021 0100 PM Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS results CONTINUED on 10/4/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • Hearing10/04/2021 at 01:00PM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC; Result: CONTINUED;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS HEARING: PLAINTIFF: REPRESENTED BY BRIAN CRIM DEFENDANT: NOT PRESENT CONTINUED PENDING SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$185.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 950551; Tender Amount: $185.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketPayment received:Receipt Number C 950551

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCompliance Type FILING FEE ASSESSED was satisfied with Compliance Action - FILING FEE PAID set on 8/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent PTC scheduled on 10/4/2021 at 0100 PM, JC - Judge PTC SMALL CLAIMS presiding. EventID 1351978

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED ON 8/30/2021 AS TO MGA INSURANCE COMPANY INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketASSIGNMENT OF BENEFITS ATTACHED TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCompliance FILING FEE ASSESSED has been created with due date of 8/25/2021 - id number 2273387

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00 AssessmentID 11752013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketCase 412021SC006431SCAXMA Filed with Clerk on 8/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOWES IMAGING CENTER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MGA Insurance Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARAK, ANTHONY