Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Manatee County Courts on 04/04/2021 at 23:18:53 (UTC).

1 CORINTHIANS 5:17 LLC Et Al VS RAMON PADILLA Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 1 CORINTHIANS 5 17 LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RAMON PADILLA. This case was filed in Manatee County Courts, Manatee County Courthouse located in Manatee, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HEATHER DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********98AX

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Manatee County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manatee County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Manatee, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HEATHER DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

1 CORINTHIANS 5:17 LLC

WILLIAM F DOLINSKI JR

JEANNIE VAZQUEZ

Defendants

RAMON PADILLA

SANDY PADILLA

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED TO SANDY PADILLA, AKA YAJAIRA PERDOMO, RAMON PADILLA ON 2/27/2021

03/05/2021 - RETURN OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED TO SANDY PADILLA, AKA YAJAIRA PERDOMO, RAMON PADILLA ON 2/27/2021

AUTO NEGLIGENCE STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/25/2021 - AUTO NEGLIGENCE STATEMENT OF CLAIM

STAEMENT OF CLAIM

02/25/2021 - STAEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • Hearing04/05/2021 at 10:00AM - PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE; Location: MANATEE COUNTY JUDICIAL CENTER; Room: ZOOM; Judge: SMALL CLAIMS, PTC;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED TO SANDY PADILLA, AKA YAJAIRA PERDOMO, RAMON PADILLA ON 2/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialTotal Receipts:1 receipt(s); Total Tender Amount:$320.00; Total Voided Amount:$0.00; Receipt Number: 895806; Tender Amount: $320.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUED AS TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAUTO NEGLIGENCE STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTAEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ISSUES AS TO SANDY PADILLA AKA YAJAIRA PERDOMO ON2/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EACH DEFENDANT HANDED TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less