This case was last updated from Madison County - Third Judicial Circuit Court on 05/23/2022 at 05:06:22 (UTC).

WING, ALBERT VS TRI COUNTY ELECTRIC COOPERATIV Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 WING, ALBERT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TRI COUNTY ELECTRIC COOPERATIV. This case was filed in Madison County - Third Judicial Circuit Court, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are OLIN, MELISSA GATES and OLIN, MELISSA G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

OLIN, MELISSA GATES

OLIN, MELISSA G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WING, ALBERT

Defendants

WILLIAMS, JOSHUA LEE

TRI COUNTY ELECTRIC COOPERATIV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASWECK, ELIZABETH ROSE

Defendant Attorney

DENNY, CHARLES W

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE EMERALD PARSONS

05/18/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE EMERALD PARSONS

RETURN OF SERVICE VINCE REVELS

05/18/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE VINCE REVELS

RETURN OF SERVICE LINDA PARSONS

05/18/2022:RETURN OF SERVICE LINDA PARSONS

NOTICE OF CANCELLING DEPOSITION

05/16/2022:NOTICE OF CANCELLING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DR. MICHAEL G. FOLEY

05/05/2022:NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DR. MICHAEL G. FOLEY

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

05/05/2022:AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

AMENDED NOTICE OF OF TAKING DEPO

05/05/2022:AMENDED NOTICE OF OF TAKING DEPO

SUBPOENA ISSUED ZELDA FRANCIS

05/05/2022:SUBPOENA ISSUED ZELDA FRANCIS

SUBPOENA ISSUED ADAM FRANCIS

05/05/2022:SUBPOENA ISSUED ADAM FRANCIS

SUBPOENA ISSUED VINCE REVELS

05/05/2022:SUBPOENA ISSUED VINCE REVELS

SUBPOENA ISSUED LINDA PARSONS

05/05/2022:SUBPOENA ISSUED LINDA PARSONS

DEFS' REQUEST FOR COPIES

05/05/2022:DEFS' REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DR. NARLIN BEATY

05/04/2022:NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DR. NARLIN BEATY

PLTFS NTC OF NON-OBJECTION TO PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

05/03/2022:PLTFS NTC OF NON-OBJECTION TO PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS

05/02/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS

05/02/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS

05/02/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS

05/02/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE EMERALD PARSONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE VINCE REVELS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE LINDA PARSONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DR. MICHAEL G. FOLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF OF TAKING DEPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA ISSUED ZELDA FRANCIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA ISSUED ADAM FRANCIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUBPOENA ISSUED VINCE REVELS

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITIONER'S 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITIONER'S 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAUTO NEGLIGENCE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS JOSHUA WILLAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS TRI COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MX 2021007272

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCase 402021CA000042CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRI-COUNTY ELECTRIC COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Denny, Charles W, IV