This case was last updated from Madison County Courts on 02/01/2021 at 21:52:19 (UTC).

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIET VS WILLIAMS, PAMELA

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIET filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILLIAMS, PAMELA. This case was filed in Madison County Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are E BROWNING III, BROWNING, E BAILEY III and BROWNING III, E BAILEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

E BROWNING III

BROWNING, E BAILEY III

BROWNING III, E BAILEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIET

Defendant

WILLIAMS, PAMELA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

RETURN OF SERVICE

01/11/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE

RETURN OF SERVICE

01/05/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE

ISSUED SUMMONS

12/15/2020:ISSUED SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

12/15/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/09/2021 09:00; Judge: BROWNING, E BAILEY III; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE COURTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/12/2021 09:00; Judge: BROWNING, E BAILEY III; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: MAIN COURTHOUSE SOUTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 2/9/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge E BROWNING III presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 1/12/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge E BROWNING III presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketJudge: BROWNING III, E BAILEY Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number MX 2020010055

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $185.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCase 402020SC000283SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHERR, HAROLD EARL