This case was last updated from Madison County Courts on 02/01/2021 at 22:43:54 (UTC).

WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER A VS WILLIAMS, SANDRA

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER A filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against WILLIAMS, SANDRA. This case was filed in Madison County Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MELISSA OLIN, OLIN, MELISSA GATES and OLIN, MELISSA G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MELISSA OLIN

OLIN, MELISSA GATES

OLIN, MELISSA G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILLIAMS, CHRISTOPHER A

Respondent

WILLIAMS, SANDRA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCase Status set to CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketUpdated Event HEARING on 1/26/2021 0900 AM Judge MELISSA OLIN results Disposed on 1/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketORDER DISMISSING PETITION OF INJUCNTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 1/26/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge MELISSA OLIN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event HEARING on 12/22/2020 0900 AM Judge MELISSA OLIN results CASE CONTINUED NEXT on 12/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketORDER OF CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketEvent HEARING scheduled on 12/22/2020 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge MELISSA OLIN presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DOMESTIC INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketSHERIFF'S SERVICE INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF FL D.L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketActive Process NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCase 402020DR000214DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/9/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketJudge: OLIN , MELISSA G assigned

    Read MoreRead Less