This case was last updated from Madison County Courts on 07/14/2019 17:31:43

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by WASHINGTON, TORI LASHAY against MITCHELL, MARCUS DEWAYNE in the jurisdiction of Madison County Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number ****************AXMX
  • Filing Date 06/14/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce
  • Jurisdiction Madison County Courts
  • Judge OLIN, MELISSA G
  • Courthouse Madison County Courthouse
  • County Madison
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Petitioner WASHINGTON, TORI LASHAY
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Respondent MITCHELL, MARCUS DEWAYNE
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE
  • 06/18/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 6/18/2019
  • 06/14/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS
  • 06/14/2019
  • PROCESS SERVICE MEMORANDUM
  • 06/14/2019
  • ISSUED SUMMONS
  • 06/14/2019
  • PARENTING PLAN
  • 06/14/2019
  • UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURIS/ENFORCEMENT ACT AFFIDA
  • 06/14/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE
  • 06/14/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT
  • 06/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER
  • 06/14/2019
  • WIFE'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE
  • 06/14/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES
  • 06/14/2019
  • CERTIFICATE OF INDIGENCY
  • 06/14/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT/APPLICATION FOR INDIGENT STATUS
  • 06/14/2019
  • COPY OF FL D.L.
  • 06/14/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Case 402019DR000119DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/14/2019
  • 06/14/2019
  • Judge: OLIN , MELISSA G assigned

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.