This case was last updated from Madison County Courts on 07/08/2019 16:38:31

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by WAREHOUSE HOME FURNISHING DIST against FEACHER, YOLANDA in the jurisdiction of Madison County Courts, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida.

Case Details

  • Case Number ****************AXMX
  • Filing Date 06/14/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Small Claim - Other Small Claim
  • Jurisdiction Madison County Courts
  • Judge E BROWNING III
  • Courthouse Madison County Courthouse
  • County Madison
  • State Florida

Party Details

  • Defendant FEACHER, YOLANDA
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff WAREHOUSE HOME FURNISHING DIST
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

Free with Subscription
STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/14/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

Free with Subscription
Receipt Copy

06/14/2019:Receipt Copy

Free with Subscription
NOTICE

06/14/2019:NOTICE

Free with Subscription

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE
  • 06/14/2019
  • Event HEARING scheduled on 8/13/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge E BROWNING III presiding.
  • 06/14/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED
  • 06/14/2019
  • NOTICE
  • 06/14/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM
  • 06/14/2019
  • Event HEARING scheduled on 8/13/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge E BROWNING III presiding.
  • 06/14/2019
  • Receipt Copy
  • 06/14/2019
  • Payment received: $90.00 Receipt Number MX 2019006662
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $80.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $80.00
  • 06/14/2019
  • Judge: BROWNING III, E BAILEY Assigned
  • 06/14/2019
  • Case 402019SC000186SPAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/14/2019
  • 08/13/2019
  • Event Date: 08/13/2019 09:00; Judge: BROWNING, E BAILEY III; Docket Type: HEARING; Location: MX COURTROOM

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.