This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Madison County on 07/14/2019 at 15:35:36 (UTC).

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTIN VS TAMMIE MARIE SMITH AKA TAMMIE Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTIN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against TAMMIE MARIE SMITH AKA TAMMIE. This case was filed in Third Circuit Courts - Madison County, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is OLIN, MELISSA G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Third Circuit Courts - Madison County

  • Courthouse:

    Madison County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

OLIN, MELISSA G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTIN

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TAMMIE MARIE

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPAR

TAMMIE MARIE SMITH AKA TAMMIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REIDER, DAVID LOUIS

 

Court Documents

ISSUED SUMMONS IRS

06/14/2019:ISSUED SUMMONS IRS

MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

06/14/2019:MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/14/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

ISSUED SUMMONS UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TAMMIE M SMITH

06/14/2019:ISSUED SUMMONS UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TAMMIE M SMITH

RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT #1

07/03/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT #1

ISSUED SUMMONS UNKNOWN TENANT #2

06/14/2019:ISSUED SUMMONS UNKNOWN TENANT #2

RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN SPOUSE

07/03/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN SPOUSE

ORDER OF ADJUDICATION & NTC OF HEARING

06/14/2019:ORDER OF ADJUDICATION & NTC OF HEARING

RETURN OF SERVICE USA

07/03/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE USA

RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT #2

07/03/2019:RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT #2

ANSWER OF TAMMIE M SMITH

07/01/2019:ANSWER OF TAMMIE M SMITH

NTC OF LIS PENDENS

06/14/2019:NTC OF LIS PENDENS

ISSUED SUMMONS TAMMIE M SMITH

06/14/2019:ISSUED SUMMONS TAMMIE M SMITH

ISSUED SUMMONS UNKNOWN TENANT #1

06/14/2019:ISSUED SUMMONS UNKNOWN TENANT #1

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN SPOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURN OF SERVICE USA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • RETURN OF SERVICE TAMMIE M SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 7/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER OF TAMMIE M SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 6/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 6/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 6/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ISSUED SUMMONS UNKNOWN TENANT #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ISSUED SUMMONS IRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF ADJUDICATION & NTC OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NTC OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Payment received: $450.00 Receipt Number MX 2019006699

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 Total Assessed $450.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Case 402019CA000056CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 6/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.