This case was last updated from Third Circuit Courts - Madison County on 11/14/2021 at 20:34:13 (UTC).

THOMAS, DANNY A VS ECOAST TIMBER INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 THOMAS, DANNY A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ECOAST TIMBER INC. This case was filed in Third Circuit Courts - Madison County, Madison County Courthouse located in Madison, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are OLIN, MELISSA GATES and OLIN, MELISSA G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXMX

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Madison, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

OLIN, MELISSA GATES

OLIN, MELISSA G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THOMAS, DANNY A

Defendants

MILLER, CHRISTOPHER BUZELL

ECOAST TIMBER INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NONNI, MARK WALSER

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/01/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

AUTO NEGLIGENCE COMPLAINT

09/01/2021:AUTO NEGLIGENCE COMPLAINT

ISSUED SUMMONS CHRISTOPHER MILLER

09/01/2021:ISSUED SUMMONS CHRISTOPHER MILLER

ISSUED SUMMONS ECOAST TIMBER INC

09/01/2021:ISSUED SUMMONS ECOAST TIMBER INC

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PTLIF'S 1ST INTERROGATORIES TO DEF ECOAST TIMBER INC

09/02/2021:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PTLIF'S 1ST INTERROGATORIES TO DEF ECOAST TIMBER INC

PTLF'S 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEF ECOAST TIMBER INC

09/02/2021:PTLF'S 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEF ECOAST TIMBER INC

RETURN OF SERVICE ECOAST TIMBER

09/08/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ECOAST TIMBER

ORDER DIRECTING PLTIF TO COMPLY WITH THE 3RD JUDICIAL STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

11/01/2021:ORDER DIRECTING PLTIF TO COMPLY WITH THE 3RD JUDICIAL STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

DEF ECOAST TIMBER INC'S RESPONSES TO PTLIF'S FIRST REQ FOR PRODUCTION

11/05/2021:DEF ECOAST TIMBER INC'S RESPONSES TO PTLIF'S FIRST REQ FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANT'S ECOAST TIMBER INC'S REPONSES TO PLTIFFS 1ST REQUEST FOR PRO

11/05/2021:DEFENDANT'S ECOAST TIMBER INC'S REPONSES TO PLTIFFS 1ST REQUEST FOR PRO

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ECOAST TIMBER INC'S REPONSES TO PLTIFFS 1ST REQUEST FOR PRO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEF ECOAST TIMBER INC'S RESPONSES TO PTLIF'S FIRST REQ FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING PLTIF TO COMPLY WITH THE 3RD JUDICIAL STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ECOAST TIMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS disposition on 9/7/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPTLF'S 1ST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEF ECOAST TIMBER INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PTLIF'S 1ST INTERROGATORIES TO DEF ECOAST TIMBER INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketJudge: OLIN , MELISSA G Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketActive Process SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number MX 2021007079

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 Total Assessed $420.00 Balance Remaining $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS ECOAST TIMBER INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketISSUED SUMMONS CHRISTOPHER MILLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAUTO NEGLIGENCE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCase 402021CA000038CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 9/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less